OH HB167 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 5747.01 of the Revised Code to authorize an income tax deduction for the otherwise taxable portion of a federal Pell grant or Ohio College Opportunity grant used to pay room and board for a post-secondary student, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To authorize an income tax deduction for the otherwise taxable portion of a federal Pell grant or Ohio College Opportunity grant used to pay room and board for a post-secondary student, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-16 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-16 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-16 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-09 | Effective Date | |
2011-12-09 | Governor' Action | |
2011-12-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-11-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-11-16 | Concurrence | |
2011-11-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-11-14 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-06-22 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2011-06-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-06-09 | Committee Report | |
2011-03-22 | To Ways & Means | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |