OH HB162 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-33)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 109.572, 124.23, and 5903.10 and to enact sections 5903.101 and 5903.102 of the Revised Code to provide certain professional licensing and certification rights to service members, spouses of service members, and veterans, and to eliminate the requirement that a veteran be a resident of Ohio to qualify to receive the veterans preference on civil service examinations.
Title
To provide certain professional licensing and certification rights to service members, spouses of service members, and veterans, and to eliminate the requirement that a veteran be a resident of Ohio to qualify to receive the veterans preference on civil service examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2011-06-24 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-23 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-06-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-15 | To Veterans Affairs | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 24 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
59 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
59 | 03 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 03 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |