OH HB161 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2903.41 of the Revised Code to include certain child abuse-related offenses in the violent offender database and to name the act Jacob's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Jacob's Law re:certain child abuse-related offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2022-02-09HousePassed
2022-02-08HouseReported: Criminal Justice
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
290341Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-161
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb161/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb161/RH/01/hb161_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb161/PH/02/hb161_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16058&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17421&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18306&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18299&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18396&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18844&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-161

Bill Comments

feedback