OH HB160 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-06-20 - Effective Date

Summary

To amend sections 319.20, 1705.02, 5713.08, 5715.27, and 5815.36 and to enact section 5701.14 of the Revised Code to clarify and modify the law relating to disclaimers under the Ohio Trust Code, to provide that a limited liability company may be a nonprofit entity, and to make changes regarding certain tax exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ohio Trust Code-clarify/modify disclaimers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-06-20 Effective Date
2008-03-21 Governor Action
2008-03-29 End of 10-day Period
2008-03-18 Sent to Governor
2008-03-11 Concurrence
2008-01-30 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2008-01-23 Committee Report
2007-06-14 To Judiciary Civil Justice
2007-06-14 Introduced to Senate
2007-06-13 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2007-05-24 Committee Report
2007-04-17 To Civil & Commercial Law
2007-04-17 Introduced to House

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback