OH HB158 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-27)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective 6/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 3737.52 of the Revised Code to prohibit the use of class B firefighting foam containing intentionally added PFAS chemicals for testing and training purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit use of certain firefighting foam for testing/training

Sponsors

Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]
Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. George Lang [R]
Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-02 Effective 6/13/22
2022-03-02SenatePassed
2022-02-16SenateReported: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-05-26SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-05-19HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseReported: Commerce and Labor
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373752New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-158
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb158/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb158/RH/01/hb158_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb158/PH/02/hb158_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb158/RS/03/hb158_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb158/PS/04/hb158_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb158/EN/05/hb158_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15935&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16323&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16559&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16648&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16766&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16781&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18393&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18394&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18427&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18527&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18598&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18642&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-158

Bill Comments

feedback