OH HB147 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Refer to Committee: Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.73, 935.19, 935.20, 959.131, 959.132, 1717.01, 1717.02, 1717.03, 1717.04, 1717.06, 1717.07, 1717.09, 1717.10, 2151.421, 2921.02, and 2931.18, to enact sections 1717.061, 1717.062, 1717.16, 1717.17, and 1717.18, and to repeal section 1717.14 of the Revised Code to make changes to humane society law, to make humane society agents subject to bribery law, and to establish procedures for the seizure and impoundment of certain animals and livestock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change humane society law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture
2018-11-19SenateIntroduced
2018-11-14HousePassed
2018-07-02HouseReported - Substitute: Civil Justice
2017-03-29HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
10973Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1717Amended CodeCitation Text
171701Amended CodeCitation Text
171702Amended CodeCitation Text
171703Amended CodeCitation Text
171704Amended CodeCitation Text
171706Amended CodeCitation Text
1717061New CodeSee Bill Text
1717062New CodeSee Bill Text
171707Amended CodeCitation Text
171709Amended CodeCitation Text
171710Amended CodeCitation Text
171714Repealed CodeCitation Text
171716New CodeSee Bill Text
171717New CodeSee Bill Text
171718New CodeSee Bill Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2151Amended CodeCitation Text
2151421Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2921Amended CodeCitation Text
292102Amended CodeCitation Text
2931Amended CodeCitation Text
293118Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
935Amended CodeCitation Text
93519Amended CodeCitation Text
93520Amended CodeCitation Text
959Amended CodeCitation Text
959131Amended CodeCitation Text
959132Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback