OH HB143 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3314.03, 3319.303, and 3326.11 and to enact sections 3313.539, 3314.142, 3326.27, 3707.51, 3707.511, and 3707.52 of the Revised Code with regard to concussions and head injuries in youth sports.
Title
With regard to concussions and head injuries in youth sports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-05 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-06-19 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2012-06-19 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-06-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-06-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-08 | To Health & Aging | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 13 | 538 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 13 | 539 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 142 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 07 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 07 | 511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 07 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |