OH HB140 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 133.18, 306.32, 306.322, 345.01, 345.03, 345.04, 505.37, 505.48, 505.481, 511.27, 511.28, 511.34, 513.18, 755.181, 1545.041, 1545.21, 1711.30, 3311.50, 3318.01, 3318.06, 3318.061, 3318.062, 3318.063, 3318.361, 3318.45, 3381.03, 3505.06, 4582.024, 4582.26, 5705.01, 5705.03, 5705.192, 5705.195, 5705.196, 5705.197, 5705.199, 5705.21, 5705.212, 5705.213, 5705.215, 5705.218, 5705.219, 5705.233, 5705.25, 5705.251, 5705.261, 5705.55, 5748.01, 5748.02, 5748.03, 5748.04, 5748.08, and 5748.09 of the Revised Code to enact the "Ballot Uniformity and Transparency Act" to modify the form of election notices and ballot language for property tax levies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Ballot Uniformity and Transparency Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-04-22HousePassed
2021-04-14HouseReported - Amended: Ways and Means
2021-02-24HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13318Amended CodeCitation Text
1545041Amended CodeCitation Text
154521Amended CodeCitation Text
171130Amended CodeCitation Text
30632Amended CodeCitation Text
306322Amended CodeCitation Text
34501Amended CodeCitation Text
34503Amended CodeCitation Text
34504Amended CodeCitation Text
331150Amended CodeCitation Text
331801Amended CodeCitation Text
331806Amended CodeCitation Text
3318061Amended CodeCitation Text
3318062Amended CodeCitation Text
3318063Amended CodeCitation Text
3318361Amended CodeCitation Text
331845Amended CodeCitation Text
338103Amended CodeCitation Text
350506Amended CodeCitation Text
4582024Amended CodeCitation Text
458226Amended CodeCitation Text
50537Amended CodeCitation Text
50548Amended CodeCitation Text
505481Amended CodeCitation Text
51127Amended CodeCitation Text
51128Amended CodeCitation Text
51134Amended CodeCitation Text
51318Amended CodeCitation Text
570501Amended CodeCitation Text
570503Amended CodeCitation Text
5705192Amended CodeCitation Text
5705195Amended CodeCitation Text
5705196Amended CodeCitation Text
5705197Amended CodeCitation Text
5705199Amended CodeCitation Text
570521Amended CodeCitation Text
5705212Amended CodeCitation Text
5705213Amended CodeCitation Text
5705215Amended CodeCitation Text
5705218Amended CodeCitation Text
5705219Amended CodeCitation Text
5705233Amended CodeCitation Text
570525Amended CodeCitation Text
5705251Amended CodeCitation Text
5705261Amended CodeCitation Text
570555Amended CodeCitation Text
574801Amended CodeCitation Text
574802Amended CodeCitation Text
574803Amended CodeCitation Text
574804Amended CodeCitation Text
574808Amended CodeCitation Text
574809Amended CodeCitation Text
755181Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-140
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb140/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb140/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb140/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb140/RH/01/hb140_01_RH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15827&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15949&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16337&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16355&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16442&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16817&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-140

Bill Comments

feedback