OH HB138 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4765.01, 4765.11, 4765.30, 4765.35, 4765.37, 4765.38, 4765.39, 4765.41, and 4766.01 of the Revised Code and to amend the version of section 4765.11 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect October 9, 2021, regarding the scope of emergency medical services provided by emergency medical service personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards the scope of emergency medical services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-06-16HousePassed
2021-06-09HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-02-24HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
476501Amended CodeCitation Text
476511Amended CodeCitation Text
476530Amended CodeCitation Text
476535Amended CodeCitation Text
476537Amended CodeCitation Text
476538Amended CodeCitation Text
476539Amended CodeCitation Text
476541Amended CodeCitation Text
476601Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-138
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb138/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb138/RH/01/hb138_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb138/PH/02/hb138_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16320&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16611&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16944&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16971&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17074&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17096&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-138

Bill Comments

feedback