OH HB135 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 1751.12 and to enact sections 3923.811 and 3959.21 of the Revised Code to prohibit certain health insurance cost-sharing practices.
Title
Prohibit certain health insurance cost-sharing practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported - Amended: Rules and Reference |
2022-03-21 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported: Health |
2021-02-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 51 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 811 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 59 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |