OH HB128 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-28)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 505.44, 505.84, 3743.75, 4765.07, 4765.43, and 4766.03, to enact sections 505.441 and 4765.011, and to repeal section 4765.431 of the Revised Code to revise the requirements for staffing ambulances and the priorities for distributing grants for emergency medical services, and to specify additional titles to be used by emergency medical service personnel; and extends until December 15, 2015, a moratorium on issuing fireworks manufacturer and wholesaler licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the requirements for staffing ambulances and the priorities for distributing grants for emergency medical services, and to specify additional titles to be used by emergency medical service personnel; and extends until December 15, 2015, a moratorium on issuing fireworks manufacturer and wholesaler licenses.

Sponsors

Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Rep. Nan Baker [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]
Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]
Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. John Carey [R]Rep. John Carney [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Sen. David Daniels [R]
Rep. Timothy DeGeeter [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]
Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. David Hall [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Rep. Richard Hollington [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]
Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]
Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Jon Peterson [R]
Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]
Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]
Rep. Lynn Slaby [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Sen. Jimmy Stewart [R]
Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Nina Turner [D]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Rep. Carlton Weddington [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2011-06-14 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-23 Effective Date
2011-06-21 Governor' Action
2011-06-29 End of 10-day period
2011-06-17 Sent to Governor
2011-06-14 Concurrence
2011-06-08 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-06-08 Committee Report - S
2011-04-14 To Highways & Transportation
2011-04-14 Introduced to Senate
2011-04-13 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-03-31 Committee Report - S
2011-03-01 To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security
2011-03-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3743Amended CodeCitation Text
374375Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4765Amended CodeCitation Text
4765011New CodeSee Bill Text
476507Amended CodeCitation Text
476543Amended CodeCitation Text
4765431Repealed CodeCitation Text
4766Amended CodeCitation Text
476603Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
50544Amended CodeCitation Text
505441New CodeSee Bill Text
50584Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback