OH HB126 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-22 - To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
Pending: Senate Insurance, Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-22 - To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor
Pending: Senate Insurance, Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 169.01, 169.02, 169.03, 169.06, 169.08, 169.13, 169.14, and 169.16 of the Revised Code to require the director of commerce to provide the office of budget and management with the proper data file to withhold from an unclaimed funds payment for any legal amount in an agreement to compensate a registered finder and to pay that amount directly to the finder and to make other changes in the Unclaimed Funds Law.
Title
To require the director of commerce to provide the office of budget and management with the proper data file to withhold from an unclaimed funds payment for any legal amount in an agreement to compensate a registered finder and to pay that amount directly to the finder and to make other changes in the Unclaimed Funds Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-22 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2009-12-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-12-17 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-12-03 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-04-08 | To State Government | |
2009-04-08 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 69 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 69 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 69 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 69 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 69 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 69 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 69 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 69 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_126 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_126_PH_Y.html |