OH HB122 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-17)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3902.30, 4723.94, 4731.2910, 4732.33, and 5164.95; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 4731.2910 (4743.09); and to enact sections 3701.1310, 3721.60, 4725.35, 4729.284, 4730.60, 4731.741, 4734.60, 4753.20, 4755.90, 4757.50, 4758.80, 4759.20, 4761.30, 4778.30, and 5119.368 of the Revised Code to establish and modify requirements regarding the provision of telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards the provision of telehealth services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-03-25HouseReported - Substitute: Insurance
2021-02-17HouseRefer to Committee: Insurance
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37011310New CodeSee Bill Text
372160New CodeSee Bill Text
390230Amended CodeCitation Text
472394Amended CodeCitation Text
472535New CodeSee Bill Text
4729284New CodeSee Bill Text
473060New CodeSee Bill Text
47312910Amended CodeCitation Text
4731741New CodeSee Bill Text
473233Amended CodeCitation Text
473460New CodeSee Bill Text
475320New CodeSee Bill Text
475590New CodeSee Bill Text
475750New CodeSee Bill Text
475880New CodeSee Bill Text
475920New CodeSee Bill Text
476130New CodeSee Bill Text
477830New CodeSee Bill Text
5119368New CodeSee Bill Text
516495Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-122
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/PH/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15720&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15842&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16225&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16227&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16318&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16440&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-122

Bill Comments 750

feedback