OH HB109 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1345.30 and 1345.99 of the Revised Code to specify individuals who are permitted to recommend and fit hearing aids and to prohibit specified sales of hearing aids via mail.
Title
To specify individuals who are permitted to recommend and fit hearing aids and to prohibit specified sales of hearing aids via mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-11 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-06-26 | To *Rules | |
2013-06-26 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-06-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-03-20 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-03-20 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 45 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 45 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |