NY S04573 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to decreasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain individuals who lose their jobs due to a labor dispute, such as a strike, and who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits; decreases the suspension period from seven consecutive weeks to seven consecutive calendar days; and permits the waiting period to be served during a suspension period.
Title
Relates to decreasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain individuals who lose their jobs due to a labor dispute, such as a strike, and who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits; decreases the suspension period from seven consecutive weeks to seven consecutive calendar days; and permits the waiting period to be served during a suspension period.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.755 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.645 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6592 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.447 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06592 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.755