NY A08771 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Brant lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Brant lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.238 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.77 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | substituted for a8771 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.697 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-11-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6854 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.77 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06854 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.238