NY A04234 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the parole board to grant parole to inmates who successfully participate in a temporary release program for two years without interruption immediately prior to appearance before the board.
Title
Requires the parole board to grant parole to inmates who successfully participate in a temporary release program for two years without interruption immediately prior to appearance before the board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.160 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.292 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02693 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION