NY A02497 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - advanced to third reading cal.394
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be printed in large font type.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be printed in large font type.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.394
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S02780 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback