NY A02497 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be printed in large font type.
Title
Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be printed in large font type.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.111 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.394 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02780 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION