NY A02230 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to telecommunication companies blocking certain numbers.
Title
Relates to telecommunication companies blocking certain numbers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | print number 2230a |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04764 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION