NY A01483 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a small business energy assistance and advocacy services program as part of the division of small business to assist small businesses in accessing energy conservation, energy efficiency and renewable energy programs available through public and private sources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a small business energy assistance and advocacy services program as part of the division of small business to assist small businesses in accessing energy conservation, energy efficiency and renewable energy programs available through public and private sources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s232
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.240
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.240
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S00232 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback