NJ SR89 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes and honors critical energy and utility infrastructure workforce for service during COVID-19 pandemic and recent extreme weather events.
Title
Recognizes and honors critical energy and utility infrastructure workforce for service during COVID-19 pandemic and recent extreme weather events.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Vincent Polistina [R] | Sen. Jean Stanfield [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-03 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR153 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading