NJ SR84 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges establishment of additional bridge agreements between county colleges and four-year institutions of higher education.
Title
Urges establishment of additional bridge agreements between county colleges and four-year institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR193 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee