NJ SR82 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AR245
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress enact Military Surviving Spouses Equity Act.
Title
Urges Congress enact Military Surviving Spouses Equity Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR85 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR245 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AR245 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR82 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/82_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR82 |