NJ SR72 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges rejection of seismic blasting plans in Atlantic Ocean near Barnegat Bay.
Title
Urges rejection of seismic blasting plans in Atlantic Ocean near Barnegat Bay.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR220 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SR72 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SR/72_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR72 |