NJ SR64 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR118
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports National Endowment for the Arts; urges President and Congress to continue funding in fiscal year 2019 and beyond.
Title
Supports National Endowment for the Arts; urges President and Congress to continue funding in fiscal year 2019 and beyond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR118 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR64 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/64_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR64 |