NJ SR50 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes strong and enduring relationship between New Jersey and Taiwan; congratulates President Dr. Tasi Ing-wen, Vice President Chen Chien-jen, and Ambassador Lily L.W. Hsu.*
Title
Recognizes strong and enduring relationship between New Jersey and Taiwan; congratulates President Dr. Tasi Ing-wen, Vice President Chen Chien-jen, and Ambassador Lily L.W. Hsu.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR151 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Filed with Secretary of State