NJ SR39 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR107
Note: Carry Over of previous AR222
Note: Carry Over of previous SR132
Note: Carry Over of previous AR222
Note: Carry Over of previous SR132
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court to study reasonableness of lowering court fees in civil asset forfeiture cases.
Title
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court to study reasonableness of lowering court fees in civil asset forfeiture cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR39 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
AR60 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AR222 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SR132 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
AR60 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AR222 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SR132 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SR39 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SR/39_I1.HTM |