NJ SR29 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes expansion of oil and natural gas drilling on Outer Continental Shelf.
Title
Opposes expansion of oil and natural gas drilling on Outer Continental Shelf.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (36-0) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR78 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR29 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/29_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR29 |