NJ SR133 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR70
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Suez North America to aggressively replace its lead service lines and urges certain State entities to hold company accountable to aggressively replace those service lines.
Title
Urges Suez North America to aggressively replace its lead service lines and urges certain State entities to hold company accountable to aggressively replace those service lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR133 (Carry Over) 2019-05-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
AR259 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
AR259 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR133 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/133_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR133 |