NJ SJR98 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR29
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-13)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently designates April 23 as "Fibrodysplasia Ossificans Progressiva Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Permanently designates April 23 as "Fibrodysplasia Ossificans Progressiva Awareness Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Ajr147 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR147 |
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR98 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
AJR147 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SJR98
AJR147 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by SJR98
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SJR98 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SJR/98_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR98 |