NJ SJR69 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates April 2nd of each year as "World Autism Awareness Day."
Title
Designates April 2nd of each year as "World Autism Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR33 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SJR69 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SJR/69_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR69 |