NJ SJR62 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR79
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR247
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September 22nd of each year as "Veterans Suicide Awareness & Remembrance Day."
Title
Designates September 22nd of each year as "Veterans Suicide Awareness & Remembrance Day."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR62 (Carry Over) 2023-06-12 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR67 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR247 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR67 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR247 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee