NJ SJR21 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR106
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR179
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR179
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates January 9 of each year as "Law Enforcement Officer Appreciation Day" in NJ.
Title
Designates January 9 of each year as "Law Enforcement Officer Appreciation Day" in NJ.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR106 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR29 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR179 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR29 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR179 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SJR21 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SJR/21_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR21 |