NJ SJR21 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to amend Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA) to include substance use disorder among disabilities qualifying children for special education programs and services.
Title
Urges President and Congress to amend Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA) to include substance use disorder among disabilities qualifying children for special education programs and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR81 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SJR21 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SJR/21_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR21 |