NJ SCR91 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR173

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-14 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes constitutional amendment to allow certain organizations to use proceeds from games of chance to benefit organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes constitutional amendment to allow certain organizations to use proceeds from games of chance to benefit organization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-14SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
2020-12-14SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
2020-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR159 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
SCR173 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback