NJ SCR75 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR121
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR135
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Post-ratifies Amendment XI to U.S. Constitution barring federal court lawsuits against states by private parties in most circumstances.
Title
Post-ratifies Amendment XI to U.S. Constitution barring federal court lawsuits against states by private parties in most circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR75 (Carry Over) 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SCR135 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
ACR179 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SCR135 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
ACR179 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR75 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/75_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR75 |