NJ SCR67 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May 15 through 21, 2011, as "Emergency Medical Services Week." *
Title
Designates May 15 through 21, 2011, as "Emergency Medical Services Week." *
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. David Rible [R] |
Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Substituted for ACR155 | |
2011-02-03 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-10-07 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-09-13 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR131 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - Motion To Table (44-36-0) (Cryan)