NJ SCR61 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR90
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR26
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR26
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges U.S. President and Congress to enact legislation giving registered organ donors priority in organ allocation.
Title
Urges U.S. President and Congress to enact legislation giving registered organ donors priority in organ allocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR90 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SCR26 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR119 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
SCR26 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR119 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee