NJ SCR60 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR65
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR96
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR65
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR93
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR96
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR65
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes temporary constitutional amendment allowing State constitutional convention convened to reform system of property taxation to propose statutory changes.
Title
Proposes temporary constitutional amendment allowing State constitutional convention convened to reform system of property taxation to propose statutory changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR60 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SCR60 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
ACR61 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
ACR65 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SCR93 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SCR60 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
ACR61 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
ACR65 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SCR93 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR60 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/60_I1.HTM |