NJ SCR53 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Commission on Reentry Services for Women."
Title
Establishes the "Commission on Reentry Services for Women."
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR92 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (77-0-0) |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR92 |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR92 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Substituted by SCR53