NJ SCR52 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SCR51
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR141

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Memorializes Congress to enact legislation to provide Medicare coverage for incontinence products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorializes Congress to enact legislation to provide Medicare coverage for incontinence products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-31SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

SCR51 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR141 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
ACR150 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback