NJ SCR45 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR29
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR91
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR15
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR243
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR91
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR15
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-09 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-09 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to provide property tax exemption for primary residence of surviving spouse of law enforcement officer or firefighter killed in the line of duty.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to provide property tax exemption for primary residence of surviving spouse of law enforcement officer or firefighter killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR45 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
SCR45 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
SCR45 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
ACR104 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
ACR243 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SCR45 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
SCR45 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
ACR104 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
ACR243 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee