NJ SCR44 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR75
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR110
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR230
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR166
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR110
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR230
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR166
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Secretary of Higher Education and Educational Opportunity Fund Board to study and modernize program regulations, particularly regulations related to student funding priority levels.
Title
Urges Secretary of Higher Education and Educational Opportunity Fund Board to study and modernize program regulations, particularly regulations related to student funding priority levels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR44 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SCR44 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR54 (Same As) 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR230 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
SCR166 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
SCR44 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR54 (Same As) 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
ACR230 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
SCR166 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR44 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/44_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR44 |