NJ SCR43 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR107

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Public Hearing Held SSG
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes constitutional amendment to change legislative Apportionment Commission membership; establishes new requirements on commission for process and legislative district composition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes constitutional amendment to change legislative Apportionment Commission membership; establishes new requirements on commission for process and legislative district composition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13SenatePublic Hearing Held SSG
2018-11-26SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
2018-11-26SenateConcurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
2018-11-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR60 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SCR107 (Carry Over) 2016-05-26 - Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback