NJ SCR39 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR171
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates 100th anniversary of passage of 19th Amendment guaranteeing women right to vote.
Title
Commemorates 100th anniversary of passage of 19th Amendment guaranteeing women right to vote.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Erik Peterson [R] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR127 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR127 |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR171 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR127 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Substituted by SCR39
ACR127 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Substituted by SCR39
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR39 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/39_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR39 |