NJ SCR36 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR157

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges federal government to make National Practitioner Data Bank available to state health care professional boards without cost.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges federal government to make National Practitioner Data Bank available to state health care professional boards without cost.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

SCR157 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
ACR166 (Same As) 2021-01-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback