NJ SCR2 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR91
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR3
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR3
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment to require payments by State to State-administered retirement systems and establish in Constitution right of public employees to pension benefit; provides for enforcement of funding obligations and benefit rights.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment to require payments by State to State-administered retirement systems and establish in Constitution right of public employees to pension benefit; provides for enforcement of funding obligations and benefit rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR2 (Carry Over) 2016-03-18 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
ACR109 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
ACR3 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
ACR109 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
ACR3 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/SCR2 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/SCR/2_I1.HTM |