NJ SCR185 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges New Jersey institutions of higher education to take action on ensuring rights for contingent faculty.
Title
Urges New Jersey institutions of higher education to take action on ensuring rights for contingent faculty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR254 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (61-10-3) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR254 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-10) |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
ACR254 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by SCR185
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR185 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/185_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR185 |