NJ SCR167 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns US Department of Housing and Urban Development rule proposal to weaken protections for homeless transgender persons.
Title
Condemns US Department of Housing and Urban Development rule proposal to weaken protections for homeless transgender persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR238 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (63-1-10) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR238 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-0) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR238 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SCR167
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR167 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/167_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR167 |